Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teodolfo Cardinal Mertel

Deceased

Deacon of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Note(s): (last survivng non-priest cardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1806Born
15 Mar 185852.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185852.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
16 May 185852.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of the Roman Curia - Other
18 Nov 188175.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
24 Mar 188478.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
11 Jul 189993.4DiedDeacon of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Teodolfo Mertel (VIAF: 73232427)
Teodolfo Cardinal Mertel (born , died ) Deacon of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllumiere, Italy

  • a cardinal for 41.3 years

Source(s):
  • c0: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49, and Page 54
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022