Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Mercati

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archive

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

Priest of Reggio Emilia

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1866Born
21 Sep 188922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
15 Jun 193669.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 193669.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
15 Jun 193669.4AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
15 Jun 193669.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
23 Aug 195790.6DiedPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mercati
Giovanni Cardinal Mercati (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Gaida

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast