Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Mercadillo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
7 Aug 169451.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Nov 169451.8ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
Nov 1695³52.8Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Jul 170461.5DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Mercadillo
Bishop Juan Manuel Mercadillo O.P. (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Puebla de Almoradiel

  • a bishop for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 238, Number 1,475
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast