Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Mella

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1397²Born
12 Apr 143437.2AppointedBishop of León, Spain
26 Aug 143740.6AppointedBishop of León, Spain
6 Apr 144043.2AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
17 Dec 145659.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 145659.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
20 May 146568.3AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
12 Oct 146770.7DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan de Mella
Juan Cardinal de Mella (born 1397, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast