Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot David Arthur Melançon, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Elveto-Americana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1914Born
15 Dec 193420.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jul 193925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for David Arthur Melançon
Abbot David Arthur Melançon O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonaldsonville, LA, USA

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast