Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Yakiv Medvetskyj (Medweckyj)

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1880Born
7 Apr 190525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
3 Jul 193656.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
3 Oct 193656.7InstalledApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
27 Jan 194161.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Yakiv Medvetskyj (Medweckyj)
Father Yakiv Medvetskyj (Medweckyj) (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Lemkowszczyzna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsvitova, Ukraine

  • a priest for 35.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast