Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Meda

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1665BornMilano
12 Nov 169025.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Nov 169025.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 170236.2AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
29 Jan 170236.2Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
18 Jul 173367.7DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Meda:
Bishop Filippo Meda (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,217
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015