Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Mauro Meacci, O.S.B.

Abbot of Subiaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1955 BornPisa
28 Dec 198126.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Jul 198832.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Feb 199640.2AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro Meacci
Abbot Mauro Meacci O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Subiaco

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Subiaco.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016