Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heber MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600Born
162525.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 164242.1AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
Jun 1643³43.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
27 Jun 164343.4AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
17 Sep 165050.7DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heber MacMahon (McMahon)
Bishop Heber MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInniskeen, Co. Monaghan

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast