Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Francis McDonnel, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1770²BornIreland
1790²20.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1800²30.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jan 181646.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 181646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
23 Mar 181646.2ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
23 Mar 181646.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
5 Nov 184373.8DiedPriest of Order of Friars Minor

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles Francis McDonnel
Father Charles Francis McDonnel O.F.M. (born 1770, died ) Priest of Order of Friars Minor

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816
  • b: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016