Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theophilus MacCartan

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹Born
1730¹30.0Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
27 Aug 176060.6SelectedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
10 Sep 176060.6ConfirmedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1761¹61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
10 Dec 177878.9DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theophilus MacCartan
Bishop Theophilus MacCartan (born 1700, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAughnagon, Co. Down
Ordained PriestBallykinlar

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 38
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast