Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Mazzio

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1765Born
15 Mar 183064.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
15 Mar 183064.3Elevated to Cardinal
4 Feb 183266.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Mazzio
Raffaele Cardinal Mazzio (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast