Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Mazza

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1702BornMontemileto
18 Dec 172826.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 174644.0SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
10 Apr 174744.3ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
16 Apr 174744.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
30 Nov 176765.0SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
25 Jan 176865.1ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
5 Apr 178784.3DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Mazza:
Bishop Tommaso Mazza (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155, and Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015