Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1702Born
26 Nov 175351.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
26 Nov 175351.6Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 175654.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
30 Jan 175855.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Luigi Mattei
Luigi Cardinal Mattei (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast