Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugene Matthews

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹Born
31 Aug 160935.6AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
2 May 161137.3AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
1 Sep 162349.6DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugene Matthews
Archbishop Eugene Matthews (born 1574, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClogher, Diocese of Clogher

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 154, and Page 177
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018