Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vasyl Mastiukh (Maścjuch)

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1873Born
5 Nov 189926.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
12 Nov 189926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Nov 1934³61.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland
12 Mar 193662.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Mastiukh (Maścjuch)
Father Vasyl Mastiukh (Maścjuch) (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lemkowszczyzna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowa Wies

  • a priest for 36.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018