Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Marshalk von Ebenth

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1503SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
11 Dec 1503ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
30 Jan 1505DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Marshalk von Ebenth (VIAF: 55291679)
Bishop Georg Marshalk von Ebenth (died ) Bishop of Bamberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast