Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Martuccio (Maricucci)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sarno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1536AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
2 Mar 1545AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
16 Mar 1547AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
1548¹ResignedBishop of Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Martuccio (Maricucci)
Bishop Donato Martuccio (Maricucci) , Bishop Emeritus of Sarno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast