Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Marliani

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1461AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
24 Apr 1475AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
12 Oct 1475DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Marliani
Bishop Michele Marliani (died ) Bishop of Piacenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 247, and Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1461, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast