Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gabriele (Ezio) Marinucci, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Agostiniani Scalzi

Titular See: (Romitani Scalzi di S. Agostino)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1916BornGiulianova
Sep 193519.4ProfessedMember of Agostiniani Scalzi
13 Jul 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
Dec 196347.7AppointedPrior General of Agostiniani Scalzi
20 Feb 198063.9DiedPrior General Emeritus of Agostiniani Scalzi

MicroData Summary for Gabriele (Ezio) Marinucci:
Father Gabriele (Ezio) Marinucci O.A.D. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Agostiniani Scalzi

  • a priest for 38.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015