Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo Marini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1509BornChio
5 Mar 155041.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mantova, Italy
5 Mar 155041.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
26 Jan 156051.1AppointedBishop of Lanciano, Italy
9 Feb 156253.1AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
7 Oct 156657.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Alba (Pompea), Italy
1572²63.0ResignedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Jun 157364.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Marini:
Archbishop Leonardo Marini O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 218, and Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013