Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Maria Cardinal Marini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1667BornGenoa, Italy
29 May 171548.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 171548.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 171648.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
23 Jun 173871.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
15 Jul 173972.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
7 Aug 174174.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
16 Jan 174779.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Marini:
Cardinal Carlo Maria Marini (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

  • a cardinal for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013