Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro de Maria, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Priest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1866Born
18 Apr 188822.1ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
22 Sep 188822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1905²38.9AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
28 Apr 192357.2DiedPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Maria
Bishop Pietro de Maria P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontestura, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast