Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Marefoschi Compagnoni

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1714BornMacerata, Italy
29 Jan 177055.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
10 Sep 177056.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 177056.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
177156.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
177156.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
23 Dec 178066.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites

MicroData Summary for Mario Marefoschi Compagnoni:
Cardinal Mario Marefoschi Compagnoni (born , died ) Prefect of Rites

  • a cardinal for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Jan 1770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013