Catholic-Hierarchy DC

António Cardinal Martins de Chaves

Deceased

Bishop of Porto

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1423AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
18 Dec 1439Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 1440AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
6 Jul 1447DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Martins de Chaves:
Cardinal António Martins de Chaves (died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a cardinal for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013