Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johan Månsson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jun 1533AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
28 Jul 1533Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
22 Mar 1544DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Johan Månsson
Archbishop Johan Månsson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

  • a bishop for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018