Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Gebhard von Mansfeld

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1558SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
31 Jan 1560ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Nov 1562DiedArchbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Gebhard von Mansfeld
Father Johann Gebhard von Mansfeld (died ) Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018