Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Mangelli Orsi

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1762Born
27 Jan 184380.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 184380.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
22 Feb 184481.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
4 Mar 184683.3DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Paolo Mangelli Orsi
Paolo Cardinal Mangelli Orsi (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast