Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iņigo Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1444AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Mar 1457AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
10 May 1475AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
15 Jan 1483AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Apr 1485DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Iņigo Manrique de Lara
Archbishop Iņigo Manrique de Lara (died Apr 1485) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 123, and Page 159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165, and Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast