Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Malvasia

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1748BornBologna, Italy
Sep 178335.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181667.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181667.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
12 Sep 181971.4DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Malvasia:
Cardinal Alessandro Malvasia (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013