Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dondazio Alessio Malvicini Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1675Born
10 Jan 171236.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Feb 171236.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 171236.7AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
11 Sep 171236.8Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
17 Feb 171741.3DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dondazio Alessio Malvicini Fontana
Bishop Dondazio Alessio Malvicini Fontana (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMottaziana
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 5.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 18
  • ob: CB, 27 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast