Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo Melchor Magi Gómez, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1732BornVinaroz
14 Oct 179765.8AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
179866.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
26 Sep 180371.7DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Melchor Magi Gómez:
Bishop Raimundo Melchor Magi Gómez O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

  • a bishop for 5.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013