Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino de Maggio (Madio da Tramonti)

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Apr 1463AppointedBishop of Bisaccia, Italy
24 Aug 1487AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
18 Nov 1507DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino de Maggio (Madio da Tramonti)
Bishop Martino de Maggio (Madio da Tramonti) (died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 106, and Page 268
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,463, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast