Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Marie Maggi, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Titular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Oct 1738AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
8 Oct 1738AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
3 Oct 1739Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
17 Dec 1742SucceededVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
20 Aug 1743DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

MicroData Summary for Louis Marie Maggi
Bishop Louis Marie Maggi O.P. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,739, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast