Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Madgett

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703²Born
10 Nov 175249.8SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
11 Dec 175249.9ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
8 Feb 175350.1SelectedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
11 Feb 175350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
23 Feb 175350.1ConfirmedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
23 Mar 176562.2DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Madgett
Bishop Nicholas Madgett (born 1703, died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLimerick

  • a bishop for 12.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,479
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 32
  • bd/d: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 79, and Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast