Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Lynagh (Lynan)

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747¹Born
21 Sep 177124.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 May 180356.3AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
4 Jun 180457.4Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
27 Apr 180861.3DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Lynagh (Lynan)
Bishop Charles Lynagh (Lynan) (born 1747, died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestport, Co. Mayo
Death PlaceWestport, Co. Mayo
Buried Place (Original)Aughagour

  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 57
  • d: CB, 10 Sep 2016
  • op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast