Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek ze Lwowa

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1534AppointedBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine
26 Apr 1536DiedBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Franciszek ze Lwowa
Bishop Franciszek ze Lwowa (died ) Bishop of Kyiv (Kijów)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLwów
Death PlaceUhowo, Diocese of Lutsk (Łuck)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 7*
  • ln/bp/d: CB, 17 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Sep 2020

Quantcast