Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hugues of Lusignan

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380¹BornCyprus
8 Jul 141131.5AppointedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
5 Mar 142141.1AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
1424²44.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 May 142646.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142646.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
11 Mar 143151.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Apr 143151.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Jun 143656.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Apr 144060.2ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
5 Aug 144262.5Died

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues of Lusignan:
Father Hugues of Lusignan (died ) Priest of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 13.8 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015