Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sarmiento de Luna y Enríquez

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornMadrid
6 Dec 165448.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 165549.4AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
8 Apr 165751.3SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
9 Jul 165751.5ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
28 Jul 166155.6DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sarmiento de Luna y Enríquez:
Bishop Antonio Sarmiento de Luna y Enríquez (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a priest for 6.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 143, and Page 311
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 185, Number 1,158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013