Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Lunati

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1452²Born
20 Sep 149341.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149341.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
10 Jul 149543.5AppointedAdministrator of Aquino, Italy
13 Nov 149543.8ResignedAdministrator of Aquino, Italy
8 Aug 149745.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Lunati (VIAF: 47828608)
Bernardino Cardinal Lunati (born 1452, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast