Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Evaristo Cardinal Lucidi

Deceased

Secretary of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1866Born
8 Dec 191650.1AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Dec 192357.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 192357.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
31 Mar 192962.4DiedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Evaristo Lucidi
Evaristo Cardinal Lucidi (born , died ) Secretary of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefranco, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018