Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Lucich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Drivasto (Drivost)


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1636AppointedBishop of Drivasto (Drivost), Albania
17 Aug 1636Ordained BishopBishop of Drivasto (Drivost), Albania
2 Jan 1648DiedBishop of Drivasto (Drivost), Albania

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Lucich:
Bishop Girolamo Lucich O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Drivasto (Drivost)

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 15
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015