Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michelangelo Cardinal Luchi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1744Born
23 Feb 180156.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Sep 180157.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 180157.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
18 Aug 180258.3AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
29 Sep 180258.4DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Luchi
Michelangelo Cardinal Luchi O.S.B. (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast