Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de La Tour

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1587AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
4 Sep 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
10 Sep 1594ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
8 Sep 1595DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de La Tour
Bishop Antoine de La Tour (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Death PlaceRocamadour, Lot

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 1 Dec 2017