Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustache Le Séneschal de Carcado

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1623Born
1 Jun 168662.6SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
7 Jul 169268.7ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
7 Sep 169268.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
15 May 169470.5DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

MicroData Summary for Eustache Le Séneschal de Carcado
Bishop Eustache Le Séneschal de Carcado (born , died ) Bishop of Tréguier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes

  • a bishop for 1.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 387
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast