Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Lozano, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1610³BornJumilla, Spain
27 Aug 164636.4SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
17 Dec 164636.7ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
23 Jul 165545.3SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
29 May 165646.1ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
4 Feb 166958.8AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
26 Apr 167767.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Plasencia, Spain
3 Jul 167969.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lozano:
Archbishop Juan Lozano O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 305, and Page 316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 347, and Page 235
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 176, Number 1,097
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015