Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal de Lorraine-Vaudémont (III)

Deceased

Administrator of Strasbourg

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1567BornNancy
18 Jul 157811.0AppointedBishop of Metz, France
20 Dec 158922.5Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 159123.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
9 Jun 159224.9SelectedAdministrator of Strasbourg, France
1 Jul 159225.0ConfirmedAdministrator of Strasbourg, France
24 Nov 160740.4DiedAdministrator of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Lorraine-Vaudémont (III):
Cardinal Charles de Lorraine-Vaudémont (III) (born , died ) Administrator of Strasbourg

  • a cardinal for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1589
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013