Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Lord, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1533AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
27 Aug 1533AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
18 Jan 1534Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
18 May 1534DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁶ Before ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Christopher Lord
Bishop Christopher Lord O. Praem. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for .3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 299
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,820
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast