Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Ramiro López, I.V.E.

Superior of Tadjikistan

Priest of Other

Titular See: (Istituto del Verbo Incarnato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1978 Born
15 Sep 200224.0Perpetual VowsMember of Other
29 Aug 200324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Other
19 Sep 201335.0AppointedSuperior of Tadjikistan

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ramiro López
Father Pedro Ramiro López I.V.E. (born ) Superior of Tadjikistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael, Argentina

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tadjikistan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast