Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Longo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1700BornBenevento
16 Feb 171616.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Sep 172222.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Feb 172424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 174646.0AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
13 Mar 174646.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
19 Oct 174949.6DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Longo:
Bishop Angelo Longo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Teano

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015